U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12566
  • Case Name: Coastal Excavation Corp.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Supplemental Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.