U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meredith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • April 17, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.