U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10362-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ciliberto
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Government Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.