U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10444
  • Case Name: Chukwa Opanwa Oji
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amend]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amend]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.