U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10426
  • Case Name: Guzman Trading, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order Discharging Trustee/Closing Case]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Extend Time]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Vote]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Signature Page]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.