U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10490
  • Case Name: Renee Nattia Walker and Rajay Paul Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Extend Time]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Signature Page]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order to Update]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.