U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40263
  • Case Name: Kelly Lee LeBlanc
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Agreement]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Withdrawal of Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [MDOR/IRS Withdrawal of Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Signature Page]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order to Update]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.