U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10083
  • Case Name: Dana F. Greene
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Response]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Employ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Asset Notice Report]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Employ]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Extend Time]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [2004 Examination]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.