U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12236
  • Case Name: LJB LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Supplemental Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Sale]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Application to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.