U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Orovio-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Speedy Trial]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Canceling Deadline]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Government Brief]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Defendant Brief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 13, 2025: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.