U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10223
  • Case Name: Matthew T. Griffin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Exhibit]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Opposition]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order (Generic)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Status Report]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.