U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10365
  • Case Name: Khouri E Rice
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Amended Order]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Amend]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order Vacating Order]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Response]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Notice of Abandonment]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Avoid Lien]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Intent]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Schedules (Original)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.