U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10493
  • Case Name: William J Rice
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Intent]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order to Update]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.