U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alfredo Lievano et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 18, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 02, 2025: [Brady Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 13, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.