U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alvarez-Manzanares
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Canceling Deadline]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 14, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing for Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.