U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mc-91069
  • Case Name: In re LastPass Data Security Incident Litigation
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.