U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-30687
  • Case Name: Jasmin D Thornton and Anthony Thornton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Objection to Debtor's Claims of Exemption/Homestead Exemption]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Amend]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Application to Employ]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Asset Notice Report]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.