U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10507
  • Case Name: Ahmed Haddad
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amend]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amend]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amend]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Signature Page]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.