U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10337
  • Case Name: Donna S Cannatelli
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Request for Telephonic Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Response]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Amend]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.