U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10323
  • Case Name: Protec RE Holding, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Supplemental Document]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedules (Original)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.