U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12175
  • Case Name: Scott Henry Hall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Withdrawal of Document]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amend]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection to Debtor's Claims of Exemption/Homestead Exemption]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amend]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Withdrawal of Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection to Debtor's Claims of Exemption/Homestead Exemption]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Supplemental Document]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.