U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mc-91106
  • Case Name: Pons et al v. Walter Kidde Portable Equipment, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.