U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-30014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pedro DeLeon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 09, 2025: [Report and Order on Final Status Conference by MJ]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Letter- non-motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 17, 2025: [Excludable Delay]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 14, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.