U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10509
  • Case Name: Jing H Chan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Vacate]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Signature Page]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Extend Time]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Order on Motion to Extend]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Extend Time]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Statement of Intent]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Order to Update]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.