U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10519
  • Case Name: Gerard Larney
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice to Consumer Debtor]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order to Update]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.