U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10059
  • Case Name: Hyam M. Saba
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Conference]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Withdrawal of Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Schedules (Original)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.