U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-01045
  • Case Name: Aquino v. Drakhlin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Application to Defer Payment]
  • March 17, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Defer Fee]
  • March 17, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Adversary Cover Sheet]
  • March 17, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.