U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30150
  • Case Name: 7Q59 Amherst, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Order (Generic)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Small Business Monthly Operating Report]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Status Report]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Amend]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Counterclaim]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order To Set Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Cash Collateral]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.