U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41263
  • Case Name: US Eco Products Corporation
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Opposition]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [File Late]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [For Order/Authority]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Amended Plan]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Amended Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Determine]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order (Generic)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Affidavit]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Affidavit]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Response]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.