U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40215
  • Case Name: Gail E. Mallardo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Asset Notice Report]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Employ]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Amend]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Amend]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Statement of Intent]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.