U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10410
  • Case Name: Lori A Dossett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Signature Page]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Intent]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order to Update]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.