U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41224
  • Case Name: Amy E Lopata and Peter J Lopata
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Application to Employ]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Asset Notice Report]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Employ]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order Discharging Debtor Ch. 7]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.