U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41323
  • Case Name: David L. Fuller
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Appellant Designation]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Extend Time]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Initial Transmittal to (BAP)/District Court]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Notice to BAP]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Objection]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Notice (Court Only)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Objection]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.