U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10061
  • Case Name: Alan Louis Upton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Withdrawal of Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amend]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges(Ch.13 Only)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection to Debtor's Claims of Exemption/Homestead Exemption]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.