U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12070
  • Case Name: Attleboro Realty LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Supplemental Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Small Business Monthly Operating Report]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Disclosure Statement]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Approve]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Plan]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Small Business Monthly Operating Report]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.