U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10543
  • Case Name: Jason Michael Kokosinski
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order to Have Filing Fee Waived]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order to Update]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.