U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-04009
  • Case Name: Yee v. Gerges
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • May 07, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Clarify]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Extend Time]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 09, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • April 08, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order To Set Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • March 20, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.