U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10547
  • Case Name: Greystone Property Development LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order To Set Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to Update]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.