U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 25, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.