U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10559
  • Case Name: Quentin Lance Victor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Motion To Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Intent]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order to Update]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.