U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30159
  • Case Name: Jessika Rivera
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Extend Time]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Extend Time]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order to Update]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.