U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-07151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Michaud, Jr.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 25, 2025: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • March 20, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing for Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.