U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-04107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing for Initial Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 31, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing for Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 21, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 21, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.