U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10568
  • Case Name: James P. Marsh
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Financial Management Course]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice to Consumer Debtor]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Intent]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order to Update]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Signature Page]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.