U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30165
  • Case Name: Eric L. Jordan and Jennifer L. Jordan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Signature Page]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.