U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-07165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Faber
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Of Removal to Another District]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • March 27, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Affidavit - Rule 5]
  • March 24, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing for Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.