U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10592
  • Case Name: Craig Panaccione and Leslie S. Moreland
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Amend]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Butler, Joseph G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.