U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10072
  • Case Name: Scotland Meadows LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Assent]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Extend Time]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice of Post/No-Post Petition Creditors]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Waiver]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order to Update]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.