U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10588
  • Case Name: Serette Georges
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Supplemental Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Amended Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Signature Page]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order to Update]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.