U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10587
  • Case Name: 59 Indian Lane, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Response]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order to Show Cause(Response)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Withdraw Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Extend Time]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order to Update]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Signature Page]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Vote]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.